List of Governors in Himachal Pradesh - Himachal Pariksha
In this article List of Governors in Himachal Pradesh we are going to share list of all Governors in Himachal Pradesh. If you are interested in this article stay continue to reading List of Governors in Himachal Pradesh.
S.No.
|
Name of Governors
|
Tenure
|
1.
|
Mr. S. Chakravarti I.C.S.
|
25.01.1971 to 16.12.1977
|
2.
|
Mr.Aminuddin Ahmad Khan
|
17.12.1977 to 25.08.1981
|
3.
|
Mr. Alok Nath Banerjee
|
26.08.1981 to 16.04.1983
|
4.
|
Mr. Hokishe Seema
|
17.04.1983 to 07.03.1986
|
5.
|
P.D. Desai (Justice) (Dual Charge)
|
08.03.1986 to 16.04.1986
|
6.
|
Vice Admiral R.K.S. Gandhi
|
17.04.1986 to 14.02.1990
|
7.
|
Mr. B. Rachaiah
|
15.02.1990 to 19.12.1990
|
8.
|
Mr. Virender Verma
|
20.12.1990 to 27.01.1993
|
9.
|
Mr. Surender Nath
|
28.01.1993 to 09.02.1993
|
10.
|
Mr. Bali Ram Bhagat
|
10.02.1993 to 29.06.1993
|
11.
|
Mr. Gulsher Ahmad Khan
|
30.06.1993 to 22.11.1993
|
12.
|
Mr. Surender Nath
|
23.11.1993 to 09.07.1994
|
13.
|
Mr. Vishwanath Ratnam
|
10.07.1994 to 29.07.1994
|
14.
|
Mr. Sudhakar Rao Naik
|
30.07.1994 to 10.09.1995
|
15.
|
Mr. Mahavir Prasad
|
11.09.1995 to 16.11.1995
|
16.
|
Mrs. Shila Kaul
|
17.11.1995 to 21.04.1996
|
17.
|
Mr. Mahavir Prasad
|
22.04.1996 to 25.07.1997
|
18.
|
Mrs. V.S. Ramadevi
|
26.07.1997 to 01.12.1999
|
19.
|
Mrs. Vishnukant Shastri
|
02.12.1999 to 23.11.2000
|
20.
|
Dr. Suraj Bhan
|
24.11.2000 to 07.05.2003
|
21.
|
Mr. Vishnu Sadashiv Kokje
|
08.05.2003 to 12.07.2008
|
22.
|
Smt. Prabha Rao
|
13.07.2008 to 24.01.2010
|
23.
|
Smt. Urmila Singh
|
25.01.2010 to 27.01.2015
|
24.
|
Mr. Kalyan Singh (Addl. Charge
|
28.01.2015 to 12.08.2015
|
25.
|
Mr. Acharya Devvrat
|
12.08.2015 to 21.07.2019
|
26.
|
Mr. Kalraj Mishra
|
22.07.2019 to 10.09.2019
|
27.
|
Mr. Bandaru Dattatreya
|
11.09.2019 to Incumbent
|